|
06/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2012
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5417.).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4027.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4660.)
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|