LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR117
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR117
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR117
Compare Versions
ACR117 Chaptered June 29, 2012
ACR117 Enrolled June 26, 2012
ACR117 Amended May 31, 2012
ACR117 Amended March 29, 2012
ACR117 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
ACR117 Chaptered June 29, 2012
ACR117 Enrolled June 26, 2012
ACR117 Amended May 31, 2012
ACR117 Amended March 29, 2012
ACR117 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare