05/16/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2012. | |||
05/16/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
05/10/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
05/10/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3473.) | |||
04/30/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/26/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4560.) | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19). | |||
03/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/06/2012 | From printer. | |||
03/05/2012 | Introduced. To print. |