California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR122 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/16/2012

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 122CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 22 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 16, 2012 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 10, 2012 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Achadjian, Cook, Fletcher, and Grove (Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Atkins, Block, Nielsen, Pan, V. Manuel Prez, and Williams) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Alejo, Allen, Ammiano, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Blumenfield, Bonilla, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Butler, Charles Calderon, Campos, Carter, Chesbro, Conway, Davis, Dickinson, Donnelly, Eng, Feuer, Fong, Fuentes, Beth Gaines, Galgiani, Garrick, Gatto, Gordon, Gorell, Hagman, Halderman, Hall, Roger Hernndez, Hill, Huber, Hueso, Huffman, Jeffries, Knight, Lara, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Mansoor, Mendoza, Miller, Mitchell, Monning, Morrell, Nestande, Olsen, Perea, Portantino, Silva, Skinner, Smyth, Solorio, Swanson, Torres, Valadao, Wagner, Wieckowski, and Yamada) MARCH 5, 2012 Relative to the Armed Forces. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 122, Achadjian. Armed Forces Day. This measure would honor and recognize the service and sacrifice made by members of the Armed Forces and their families on the occasion of Armed Forces Day on May 19, 2012. WHEREAS, Armed Forces Day was created in 1949 in connection with the consolidation of the military services in the United States Department of Defense; and WHEREAS, The purpose of Armed Forces Day is to honor the men and women who are serving in the Army, Navy, Marine Corps, Air Force, and Coast Guard, including the National Guard and Reserve components; and WHEREAS, Armed Forces Day is celebrated on the third Saturday in May, which this year is May 19, 2012; and WHEREAS, Members of the Armed Forces have performed tremendous service on behalf of the United States; and WHEREAS, Members of the Armed Forces have been killed and injured in operations to bring peace and stability in the name of democracy; and WHEREAS, All Americans express their recognition and gratitude for members of the Armed Forces at home and abroad; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature, on the occasion of Armed Forces Day 2012; (1) Honors and recognizes the service and sacrifice that members of the Armed Forces and their families gave, and continue to give, to the United States; (2) Remains committed to supporting the members of the Armed Forces and their families; (3) Encourages Americans to show their support and appreciation for members of the Armed Forces on Armed Forces Day; (4) Commends the actions of private citizens and organizations who volunteer to support America's wounded warriors; and (5) Expresses the gratitude of the American people to the members of the Armed Forces for their service on behalf of the United States; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.