07/05/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/05/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:45 p.m. | |||
06/28/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/28/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4183.) | |||
06/26/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/25/2012 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/13/2012 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/17/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/03/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/03/2012 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4674.) | |||
05/02/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
03/15/2012 | From printer. | |||
03/14/2012 | Introduced. To print. |