California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR129 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/05/2012

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 129CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 65 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 5, 2012 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 28, 2012 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 3, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Conway MARCH 14, 2012 Relative to the Corporal Jared Verbeek Memorial Overcrossing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 129, Conway. Corporal Jared Verbeek Memorial Overcrossing. This measure would designate a specified overcrossing on State Highway Route 198 in the City of Visalia as the Corporal Jared Verbeek Memorial Overcrossing. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Corporal Jared Verbeek was born May 23, 1989, in Visalia, California, to Travis and Rosalia Verbeek. Corporal Verbeek's father served in the United States Marine Corps until his retirement and his example of dedication impressed upon his son the need to also serve his country; and WHEREAS, From an early age, Corporal Verbeek sought the opportunity to wear a uniform in service of his country, including joining the Boy Scouts of America and earning 13 merit badges within his first month; and WHEREAS, Always striving to do more, and be more, than an average person, Corporal Verbeek participated in many team sports in high school, including baseball, basketball, football, track and field, and cross country; and WHEREAS, Corporal Verbeek maintained a high GPA in high school while working with the Tulare County Sheriff, where he assisted in background and training documentation, and attended Congressman Devin Nunes' military academy at night to learn more about obtaining a commission as a military officer. Corporal Verbeek was selected for a congressional appointment to Annapolis Naval Academy in Annapolis, Maryland, but instead chose to enlist with the United States Marine Corps and went to Marine Corps recruit training in San Diego, California, immediately after his graduation from high school; and WHEREAS, Corporal Verbeek graduated recruit training on February 1, 2008, and was assigned as a recruiter assistant at the Visalia recruiting substation, which pleased Corporal Verbeek because he could stay near his beloved family longer; and WHEREAS, Corporal Verbeek was assigned to Marine combat training at Marine Corps Base Camp Pendleton in Santa Margarita, California, followed by an order to Fort Lenard Wood, Missouri, where he went through his military occupational speciality training for military police, his chosen field. He then received his first duty assignment with the Military Police (MP) Company at Camp Pendleton; and WHEREAS, Corporal Verbeek married his best friend, Vanessa Salazar, and the couple had a little boy whom they named Jacob, in December of 2008; and WHEREAS, Corporal Verbeek volunteered to be an MP liaison for the First Battalion of the Fifth Marine Regiment, which was deployed on March 17, 2011, to Afghanistan; and WHEREAS, Corporal Verbeek gave the ultimate sacrifice for our security and died on June 21, 2011, from wounds sustained while conducting combat operations in Helmand province, Afghanistan; and WHEREAS, Corporal Verbeek's family and friends recall his thoughtfulness, selfless acts, laughter, brutal honesty, love for his family, and determination to serve his country; and WHEREAS, Corporal Verbeek's service awards include the Purple Heart, the Combat Action Ribbon, the National Defense Service Medal, the Global War on Terrorism Service Medal, the Marine Corps Good Conduct Medal, and the Afghanistan Campaign Medal, and a nomination for a posthumous Purple Heart; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Corporal Verbeek's great contributions and sacrifice in service of the United States Marine Corps and his country, it would be a fitting tribute to designate an overcrossing of State Highway Route 198 in his hometown, the City of Visalia, as the Corporal Jared Verbeek Memorial Overcrossing; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the South Giddings Avenue overcrossing on State Highway Route 198 in the City of Visalia as the Corporal Jared Verbeek Memorial Overcrossing; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.