05/24/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2012. | |||
05/24/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | |||
05/21/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
05/21/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3550.) | |||
05/17/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4884.) | |||
05/10/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 10). | |||
05/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/08/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/23/2012 | From printer. | |||
03/22/2012 | Introduced. To print. |