LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR139
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR139
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR139
Compare Versions
ACR139 Chaptered May 24, 2012
ACR139 Enrolled May 22, 2012
ACR139 Amended May 17, 2012
ACR139 Amended May 8, 2012
ACR139 Introduced March 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
ACR139 Chaptered May 24, 2012
ACR139 Enrolled May 22, 2012
ACR139 Amended May 17, 2012
ACR139 Amended May 8, 2012
ACR139 Introduced March 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare