07/11/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 47, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/11/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. | |||
07/01/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
07/01/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1689.) | |||
06/28/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/27/2011 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/15/2011 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/02/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/19/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/19/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1439.) | |||
05/12/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 11). | |||
05/03/2011 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
03/03/2011 | From printer. | |||
03/02/2011 | Introduced. To print. |