BILL NUMBER: ACR 31CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 47 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 11, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE JULY 1, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 19, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Olsen (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bill Berryhill and Galgiani) (Coauthors: Senators Berryhill and Cannella) MARCH 2, 2011 Relative to the CHP Officer Earl Scott Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 31, Olsen. CHP Officer Earl Scott Memorial Highway. This measure would designate the portion of State Highway Route 219 between State Highway Routes 99 and 108 in Stanislaus County as the CHP Officer Earl Scott Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, On February 17, 2006, California Highway Patrol Officer Earl Scott was tragically shot and killed while making a traffic stop on State Highway Route 99 in Stanislaus County; and WHEREAS, Officer Scott was 36 years old and had served with the California Highway Patrol (CHP) for five years; and WHEREAS, Officer Scott came from a long line of family members who devoted themselves to public service under the auspices of the CHP, including his father and two uncles who retired from the CHP as sergeants, and a cousin who currently serves as a sergeant with the CHP; and WHEREAS, Officer Scott is remembered as being the first to volunteer for such causes as shaving his head for "Shave the Brave," a fundraiser for cancer victims; and WHEREAS, Officer Scott also frequently took youth Law Enforcement Explorers on ride-alongs; and WHEREAS, Officer Scott touched many lives and leaves behind many fellow officers whose friendship with Officer Scott was more akin to being a family; and WHEREAS, Officer Scott is survived by his father, stepmother, and sister; and WHEREAS, Through adoption of Senate Concurrent Resolution 120 (Resolution Chapter 130, Statutes of 2010), the Legislature designated a portion of State Highway Route 99 in Stanislaus County in Officer Scott's memory; and WHEREAS, The Legislature now desires, instead, to designate a portion of State Highway Route 219 in Stanislaus County in Officer Scott's memory; and now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the portion of State Highway Route 219 between State Highway Route 99 (Milepost Marker: 219 STA 0.116) and State Highway Route 108 (Milepost Marker: 219 STA 4.858) in Stanislaus County is hereby designated the CHP Officer Earl Scott Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the designation made by Senate Concurrent Resolution 120 (Resolution Chapter 130, Statutes of 2010) is hereby rescinded; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing the special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit a copy of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.