07/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
07/14/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
07/14/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 1855.) | |||
06/30/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/23/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/23/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1491.) | |||
04/13/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 12). | |||
04/06/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
04/05/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Amended. | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
03/09/2011 | From printer. | |||
03/08/2011 | Introduced. To print. |