California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR34 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/28/2011

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 34CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 65 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 28, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 28, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE JULY 14, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 23, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 5, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members Lara and Alejo MARCH 8, 2011 Relative to ethnic studies. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 34, Lara. Ethnic studies programs. This measure would formally endorse the invaluable work of California's ethnic studies programs, and their faculty, staff, and students. The measure would recognize the leadership provided by the beneficiaries of those programs, and would support the continuation of ethnic studies programs in California's institutions of higher education. WHEREAS, The genesis and salience of ethnic studies as an academic discipline encompass research, scholarship, and programs that study and teach the experiences, history, culture, and heritage of African Americans, Asian Americans, Chicanas and Chicanos, Latinas and Latinos, Native Americans, and other persons of color in the United States; and WHEREAS, Formal ethnic studies programs and departments at California's universities are a response to a student-led movement dating back to the 1960s, including demonstrations, student protests, and hunger strikes, where students, faculty, and community members demanded university courses that were relevant to them and their communities; and WHEREAS, The formalization of ethnic studies fostered greater demand and recognition of the need for faculty and staff from diverse communities, allowing for broader representation at California's universities; and WHEREAS, Ethnic studies have grown into a respected academic field, complete with professional organizations, institutionalized departments and related programs across the United States, and numerous research journals and award-winning publications; and WHEREAS, The study of ethnic populations has grown to include comparative and international approaches to the study of ethnicity and the intersections of race, class, gender, and sexuality; and WHEREAS, Ethnic studies acknowledges the role of America's diverse racial and ethnic peoples as equal actors in the history of California and the United States; and WHEREAS, Latinos and other racial and ethnic groups account for 57 percent of California's population, making California the most ethnically and racially diverse state in the nation; and WHEREAS, A broader education on diverse racial and ethnic groups provides a fuller and deeper understanding of California and United States history and helps promote greater understanding among people from different backgrounds; and WHEREAS, Ethnic studies departments, programs, and related projects promote constructive communication and collaborative efforts between different and diverse groups and encourage the demonstration of respect, understanding, appreciation, equality, and dignity; and WHEREAS, Long-standing attacks on ethnic studies departments, programs, and related projects, and the recent increase of attacks in particular, misrepresent the intentions and serious intellectual and scholarly commitments of the ethnic studies departments; and WHEREAS, Support for ethnic studies departments, programs, and related projects, within our state's higher education segments, including budgetary commitments, will allow for the continued guidance and teaching of a new generation of students who will greatly impact and positively influence California policy and government; and WHEREAS, Support for ethnic studies within our K-12 public school system will allow a new generation to greatly impact and positively influence California's relations and policy development; and WHEREAS, Actions to ban ethnic studies in states such as Arizona distort our hallmark as a diverse nation, and mischaracterize educational curricula that affirm this diversity as reverse racism, hatred, and ethnocentrism; and WHEREAS, The elimination of ethnic studies within any of our state' s educational segments would put our students at a disadvantage from a global perspective; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature of the State of California formally endorses the invaluable work of California's ethnic studies departments, programs, and related projects, and their faculty, staff, and students; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature of the State of California also duly recognizes the leadership provided by the beneficiaries of these programs who have contributed greatly to the academic rigor, prominence, and distinguishing qualities of California's colleges and universities and the vitality of other public and private institutions, including the California state government; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature of the State of California supports the continuation of ethnic studies departments, programs, and related projects in California's institutions of higher education; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Regents of the University of California, the Board of Governors of the California State University, the Board of Trustees of California Community Colleges, and the author for appropriate distribution.