09/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 106, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
09/09/2011 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Page 3223.). | |||
09/08/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2428.) | |||
08/15/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/14/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/13/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1914.) | |||
05/27/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 27). | |||
05/16/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/06/2011 | From printer. | |||
05/05/2011 | Introduced. To print. |