LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR56
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR56
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR56
Compare Versions
ACR56 Chaptered September 28, 2011
ACR56 Enrolled September 22, 2011
ACR56 Amended August 15, 2011
ACR56 Amended June 13, 2011
ACR56 Introduced May 5, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
ACR56 Chaptered September 28, 2011
ACR56 Enrolled September 22, 2011
ACR56 Amended August 15, 2011
ACR56 Amended June 13, 2011
ACR56 Introduced May 5, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare