09/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
09/09/2011 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 3224.). | |||
09/08/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2428.) | |||
09/07/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 2331.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
09/06/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2930.) | |||
09/02/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (September 2). | |||
09/01/2011 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (September 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
08/24/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
08/23/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | |||
06/27/2011 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
06/17/2011 | From printer. | |||
06/16/2011 | Introduced. To print. |