LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR70
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR70
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR70
Compare Versions
ACR70 Chaptered September 28, 2011
ACR70 Enrolled September 26, 2011
ACR70 Amended September 7, 2011
ACR70 Amended August 23, 2011
ACR70 Introduced June 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
ACR70 Chaptered September 28, 2011
ACR70 Enrolled September 26, 2011
ACR70 Amended September 7, 2011
ACR70 Amended August 23, 2011
ACR70 Introduced June 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare