06/21/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2011. | |||
06/21/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:40 p.m. | |||
06/14/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/14/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1412.) | |||
02/08/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/07/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 276.) | |||
02/03/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 3). | |||
02/02/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
01/27/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/25/2011 | From printer. | |||
01/24/2011 | Introduced. To print. |