LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR9
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR9
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR9
Compare Versions
ACR9 Chaptered June 21, 2011
ACR9 Enrolled June 17, 2011
ACR9 Amended February 7, 2011
ACR9 Amended February 2, 2011
ACR9 Introduced January 24, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
ACR9 Chaptered June 21, 2011
ACR9 Enrolled June 17, 2011
ACR9 Amended February 7, 2011
ACR9 Amended February 2, 2011
ACR9 Introduced January 24, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare