California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR9 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/17/2011

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 9ENROLLED BILL TEXT ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 14, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 7, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 7, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 2, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Garrick (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Allen, Atkins, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Blumenfield, Bonilla, Brownley, Buchanan, Butler, Charles Calderon, Campos, Carter, Cedillo, Chesbro, Conway, Cook, Dickinson, Donnelly, Eng, Feuer, Fong, Furutani, Galgiani, Garrick, Gatto, Gordon, Gorell, Grove, Hagman, Halderman, Harkey, Hayashi, Roger Hernndez, Hill, Huber, Hueso, Huffman, Jeffries, Jones, Knight, Logue, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Mendoza, Miller, Morrell, Nielsen, Olsen, Pan, Perea, John A. Prez, V. Manuel Prez, Portantino, Skinner, Smyth, Solorio, Swanson, Torres, Valadao, Wagner, Wieckowski, Williams, and Yamada) JANUARY 24, 2011 Relative to Centennial Ronald Reagan Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 9, Garrick. Ronald Reagan Day. This resolution would declare February 6, 2011, as Ronald Reagan Day. WHEREAS, President Ronald Wilson Reagan, a man of humble background, worked throughout his life serving freedom and advancing the public good, having been employed as an entertainer, union leader, corporate spokesman, Governor of California, and President of the United States; and WHEREAS, Ronald Reagan served with honor and distinction for two terms as the 40th President of the United States of America, the second of which he earned the confidence of three-fifths of the electorate and was victorious in 49 of the 50 states in the general election--a record unsurpassed in the history of American presidential elections; and WHEREAS, In 1981, when Ronald Reagan was inaugurated President, he inherited a disillusioned nation shackled by rampant inflation and high unemployment; and WHEREAS, President Reagan's commitment to the nation's children helped lower crime and drug use in our neighborhoods; and WHEREAS, President Reagan's commitment to our Armed Forces contributed to the restoration of pride in America, her values, and those cherished by the free world, and prepared America's Armed Forces to meet 21st century challenges; and WHEREAS, President Reagan's vision of "peace through strength" led to the end of the Cold War; and WHEREAS, February 6, 2011, will be the 100th anniversary of Ronald Reagan's birth, and the seventh since his passing; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Members take great pride in honoring Ronald Reagan for his many contributions to our country and in celebrating his life; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature recognizes February 6, 2011, as Ronald Reagan Day; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.