|
09/04/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 108, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2012
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6116.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4572.)
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4601.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Amended.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2012
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|