California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR98 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 4, 2012

Amended

Bill July 3, 2012
Bill April 12, 2012