|
07/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5564.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3240.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3105.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|