California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1048 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2012

Enrolled

Bill July 3, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2012

Amended

Bill April 17, 2012
Bill March 21, 2012