|
02/29/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1913.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2255.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 706.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 452.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|