LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB105
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB105
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB105
Compare Versions
SB105 Enrolled August 16, 2011
SB105 Amended June 22, 2011
SB105 Amended April 12, 2011
SB105 Amended March 15, 2011
SB105 Introduced January 13, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB105 Enrolled August 16, 2011
SB105 Amended June 22, 2011
SB105 Amended April 12, 2011
SB105 Amended March 15, 2011
SB105 Introduced January 13, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare