|
09/19/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4682.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 5. Page 6065.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3529.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3445.) (May 7).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3307.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|