California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1050 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 15, 2012
Bill May 10, 2012
Bill April 12, 2012