|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 268, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4623.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5848.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3666.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3458.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|