California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1055 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill June 14, 2012
Bill May 15, 2012