|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6726.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6087.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3495.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3189.) (April 16).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|