California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1063 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill April 23, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012