|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 845, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 4969.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 6. Page 6448.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 6273.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 20. Page 6275.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 3646.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3590.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3309.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3022.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|