California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1064 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012
Bill March 19, 2012