|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 230, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2016.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2345.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 458.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 359.) (March 16).
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|