LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB107
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB107
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB107
Compare Versions
SB107 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB107 Enrolled August 24, 2011
SB107 Amended July 7, 2011
SB107 Amended March 23, 2011
SB107 Introduced January 13, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB107 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB107 Enrolled August 24, 2011
SB107 Amended July 7, 2011
SB107 Amended March 23, 2011
SB107 Introduced January 13, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare