|
10/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 491, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2406.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3007.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2812.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. (Corrected August 30.)
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1066.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1013.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 740.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|