LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB108
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB108
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB108
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 13, 2011
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 12, 2011
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
October 6, 2011
Compare
Amended
Bill
September 2, 2011
Compare
Bill
August 26, 2011
Compare
Bill
June 20, 2011
Compare
Bill
May 3, 2011
Compare