California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1088 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill July 3, 2012
Bill April 24, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012