LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1088
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1088
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1088
Compare Versions
SB1088 Chaptered September 19, 2012
SB1088 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB1088 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1088 Amended July 3, 2012
SB1088 Amended April 24, 2012
SB1088 Amended April 10, 2012
SB1088 Introduced February 15, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1088 Chaptered September 19, 2012
SB1088 Enrolled August 27, 2012
SB1088 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1088 Amended July 3, 2012
SB1088 Amended April 24, 2012
SB1088 Amended April 10, 2012
SB1088 Introduced February 15, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare