|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 271, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5967.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3472.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3232.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected February 17.)
|
|
|