LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1096
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1096
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1096
Compare Versions
SB1096 Chaptered September 7, 2012
SB1096 Enrolled August 16, 2012
SB1096 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1096 Amended April 12, 2012
SB1096 Amended March 20, 2012
SB1096 Introduced February 16, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1096 Chaptered September 7, 2012
SB1096 Enrolled August 16, 2012
SB1096 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1096 Amended April 12, 2012
SB1096 Amended March 20, 2012
SB1096 Introduced February 16, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare