|
09/11/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 295, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4970.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6448.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6252.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3615.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3445.) (May 7).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3261.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3021.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|