LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1099
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1099
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1099
Compare Versions
SB1099 Chaptered September 11, 2012
SB1099 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1099 Amended August 24, 2012
SB1099 Amended May 17, 2012
SB1099 Amended April 25, 2012
SB1099 Introduced February 16, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1099 Chaptered September 11, 2012
SB1099 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1099 Amended August 24, 2012
SB1099 Amended May 17, 2012
SB1099 Amended April 25, 2012
SB1099 Introduced February 16, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare