|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 712, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5081.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6671.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6673.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6555.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6254.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3665.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3310.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|