LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1105
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1105
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1105
Compare Versions
SB1105 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB1105 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB1105 Amended August 29, 2012
SB1105 Amended August 24, 2012
SB1105 Amended June 13, 2012
SB1105 Amended May 2, 2012
SB1105 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1105 Introduced February 16, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1105 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB1105 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB1105 Amended August 29, 2012
SB1105 Amended August 24, 2012
SB1105 Amended June 13, 2012
SB1105 Amended May 2, 2012
SB1105 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1105 Introduced February 16, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare