|
08/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 3713.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3591.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3265.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3189.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|