LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1139
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1139
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1139
Compare Versions
SB1139 Amended August 7, 2012
SB1139 Amended June 25, 2012
SB1139 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1139 Amended May 2, 2012
SB1139 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1139 Introduced February 21, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1139 Amended August 7, 2012
SB1139 Amended June 25, 2012
SB1139 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1139 Amended May 2, 2012
SB1139 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1139 Introduced February 21, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare