09/30/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 834, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/30/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
09/06/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |||
08/29/2012 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 9. Page 4970.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
08/28/2012 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |||
08/28/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 6441.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/20/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 19). | |||
06/13/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
06/11/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/31/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/31/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3735.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/02/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3389.) (May 1). | |||
04/20/2012 | Set for hearing May 1. | |||
02/22/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |||
02/21/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |