California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1140 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill June 13, 2012
Bill April 23, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012