|
09/26/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's item veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 565, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor with item veto.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 17. Page 5114.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6750.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 6773.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 6470.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6260.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 3742.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3591.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3121.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|